California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014