Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |