California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014