|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6592.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4762.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 4838.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|