|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6362.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4715.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5187.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|