California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014