California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014