California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2321 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/16/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2321CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 358 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 16, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 16, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gomez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Cooley and Quirk-Silva) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 5156.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2321, Gomez. Specialized license plates: domestic violence, sexual assault, and sex trafficking awareness. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue specialty license plates, including environmental license plates and specified special environmental design license plates. Under existing law, a state agency is authorized to apply to the DMV to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and the DMV is required to issue those license plates if the agency meets certain requirements. The DMV is required to charge specified fees for certain services related to the issuance of those plates. Existing law establishes a Family Violence Prevention Program within the Office of Emergency Services to provide financial and technical assistance to local domestic and family violence centers in implementing family violence prevention programs. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to apply to the DMV to sponsor a domestic violence and sexual assault awareness license plate program. The bill would establish the California Domestic Violence Prevention Fund in the State Treasury for the deposit of the revenue derived from these license plates, and would require that these funds be allocated, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to the Office of Emergency Services for purposes of funding the Family Violence Prevention Program. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5156.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5156.5. (a) The Office of Emergency Services shall apply to the department to sponsor a domestic violence and sexual assault awareness license plate program pursuant to this article. (b) The fees specified in Section 5157 shall be imposed for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of specialized license plates authorized by this section. Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, after deducting its administrative costs, the department shall deposit the revenue derived from the additional fees into the California Domestic Violence Prevention Fund, which is hereby established in the State Treasury. Upon appropriation by the Legislature, the moneys in that fund shall be allocated to the Office of Emergency Services for purposes of funding the Family Violence Prevention Program described in Section 13823.4 of the Penal Code.