Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 5106.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|