Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4933.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5298.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|