Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |