Senate | 06/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 5094.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |