|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6290.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4652.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5189.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|