09/29/2014 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4731.). | ||
Senate | 08/18/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 5277.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2014 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |