|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5960.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4379.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 31. Page 5201.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|