California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 12, 2014