California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014