|
06/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5610.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3930.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5001.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4961.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|