California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014