California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill August 12, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014