LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2412
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2412
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2412
Action History
Assembly
03/28/2014
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Assembly
03/27/2014
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/10/2014
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Assembly
02/24/2014
Read first time.
Assembly
02/23/2014
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
Assembly
02/21/2014
Introduced. To print.