California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014