Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2101.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 1331.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|