Assembly | 05/20/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |