Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 4750.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|