Senate | 08/14/2014 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5275.) | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |