Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2013 | Read first time. To print. |