California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2450 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/16/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2450CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 359 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 16, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 20, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Logue and John A. Prez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian and Wieckowski) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 5162 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2450, Logue. Specialized license plates: kidney disease awareness. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue specialty license plates, including environmental license plates and specified special environmental design license plates. Under existing law, a state agency is authorized to apply to the DMV to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and the DMV is required to issue those license plates if the agency meets certain requirements. This bill would require the State Department of Public Health to apply to the DMV to sponsor a specialized license plate that promotes awareness of kidney disease. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5162 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5162. The State Department of Public Health shall apply to the department to sponsor a kidney disease awareness license plate program pursuant to this article.