California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014