Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4952.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|