California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014