09/29/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2014. | |||
09/29/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4690.). | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5332.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 5226.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |