California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014