|
09/17/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6356.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4712.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4968.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|