LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2530
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2530
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2530
Compare Versions
AB2530 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB2530 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2530 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2530 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2530 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2530 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB2530 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB2530 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2530 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2530 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare