California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2539 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014