06/24/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2013. | |||
06/24/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1273.). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 880.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2013 | Read first time. To print. |