California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2546 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 15, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014