|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4378.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5114.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|