BILL NUMBER: AB 2547CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 272 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 22, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 22, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 7, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beth Gaines FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 18986.60 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 12.96 (commencing with Section 18986.60) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, and to repeal Sections 18986.61 and 18986.62 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2547, Beth Gaines. Placer County Integrated Health and Human Services Program. Existing law requires Placer County, upon approval of the county, and with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, to implement a pilot program for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. Under existing law, these provisions become inoperative on July 1, 2016, and are repealed on January 1, 2017. This bill would delete the provisions making the program inoperative and providing for its repeal, thereby extending that program indefinitely. The bill would delete obsolete related provisions and make other conforming changes. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for Placer County. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The heading of Chapter 12.96 (commencing with Section 18986.60) of Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: CHAPTER 12.96. PLACER COUNTY INTEGRATED HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES PROGRAM SEC. 2. Section 18986.60 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 18986.60. (a) Placer County, with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, within the existing resources of those departments, shall implement a program upon approval of that county, for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. (b) The Placer County program shall, in providing services through an integrated system to families and individuals, among other things, do all of the following: (1) Implement and evaluate a system of universal intake for those seeking services. (2) Implement and evaluate a system whereby a family or individual eligible for more than one service may be provided those services by as few as a single county employee, through an integrated, coordinated service plan. (3) Implement and evaluate a system of administration that centralizes the management and support of client services. (4) Implement and evaluate a system of reporting and accountability that provides for the combined provision of services as provided for in paragraph (2), without the loss of state or federal funds provided under current law. (c) The integrated system may include, but need not be limited to, any or all of the following: (1) Adoption services. (2) Child abuse prevention services. (3) Child welfare services. (4) Delinquency prevention services. (5) Drug and alcohol services. (6) Mental health services. (7) Eligibility determination. (8) Employment and training services. (9) Foster care services. (10) Health services. (11) Public health services. (12) Housing services. (13) Medically indigent program services. (14) All other appropriately identified and targeted services, except for dental care. (d) Programs or services shall be included in the program only to the extent that federal funding to either the state or the county will not be reduced as a result of the inclusion of the services in the program. This program shall not generate any increased expenditures from the General Fund. (e) The county and the appropriate state departments shall jointly seek federal approval of the program, as may be needed to ensure its funding and allow for the integrated provision of services. (f) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to discontinue meeting its obligations under current law to provide services or to reduce its accountability for the provision of these services. (g) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to reduce Placer County's eligibility under current law for state funding for the services included in the program. (h) Placer County shall utilize any and all state general and county funds that it is legally allocated or entitled to receive. Through the creation of integrated health and social services structures, the county shall maximize federal matching funds. (i) The appropriate state departments that are assisting and cooperating in the implementation of the program authorized by this chapter shall have the authority to waive regulations regarding the method of providing services and the method of reporting and accountability, as may be required to meet the goals set forth in subdivision (b). SEC. 3. Section 18986.61 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. SEC. 4. Section 18986.62 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. SEC. 5. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution due to the unique circumstances of Placer County and the success of the Placer County Integrated Health and Human Services Pilot Program.