LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2548
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2548
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2548
Compare Versions
AB2548 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2548 Amended August 18, 2014
AB2548 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2548 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2548 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2548 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2548 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2548 Amended August 18, 2014
AB2548 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2548 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2548 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2548 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare