Senate | 06/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2014 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |