Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|