California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2570 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2570CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 822 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 13, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Skinner FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 6141 of the Penal Code, relating to prisons. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2570, Skinner. Prisons: California Rehabilitation Oversight Board. Existing law requires the California Rehabilitation Oversight Board to regularly examine the various mental health, substance abuse, educational, and employment programs for inmates and parolees operated by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and to report to the Governor and the Legislature annually on September 15 each year, as specified, and include in the report, among other things, findings on the effectiveness of treatment efforts and recommendations with respect to modification, addition, and elimination of rehabilitation and treatment programs. This bill would additionally require the board, beginning January 1, 2015, to examine the department's effort to assist inmates and parolees to obtain postrelease health care coverage. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6141 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 6141. The California Rehabilitation Oversight Board shall meet at least twice annually, and shall regularly examine the various mental health, substance abuse, educational, and employment programs for inmates and parolees operated by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Beginning January 1, 2015, the board shall examine the department's effort to assist inmates and parolees to obtain postrelease health care coverage. The board shall report to the Governor and the Legislature annually, on September 15, and may submit other reports during the year if it finds they are necessary. The reports shall include, but are not limited to, findings on the effectiveness of treatment efforts, rehabilitation needs of offenders, gaps in rehabilitation services in the department, and levels of offender participation and success in the programs. The board shall also make recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature with respect to modifications, additions, and eliminations of rehabilitation and treatment programs. In performing its duties, the board shall use the work products developed for the department as a result of the provisions of the 2006 Budget Act, including Provision 18 of Item 5225-001-0001.