Senate | 08/14/2014 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5113.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |