California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2573 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2573INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Stone FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2573, as introduced, Stone. Foster care: transition jurisdiction. Existing law establishes transition jurisdiction for the juvenile court, and generally provides that minors who are wards in foster care placement, and certain nonminors who are eligible for aid, and who satisfy other specified criteria, including that their rehabilitative goals have been met and juvenile court jurisdiction over them as a ward is no longer required, are within the transition jurisdiction of the juvenile court. This bill would delete that criterion that the juvenile's rehabilitative goals have been met, and instead provide that a minor or nonminor over whom the juvenile court has determined jurisdiction as a ward is no longer required, and who satisfies those other specified criteria, is within the transition jurisdiction of the juvenile court. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 450. (a) A minor or nonminor who satisfies all of the following criteria is within the transition jurisdiction of the juvenile court: (1) (A) The minor is a ward who is older than 17 years and 5 months of age and younger than 18 years of age and in foster care placement, or the nonminor is a ward in foster care placement who was a ward subject to an order for foster care placement on the day he or she attained 18 years of age and on and after January 1, 2012, has not attained 19 years of age, or, commencing January 1, 2013, 20 years of age, or, commencing January 1, 2014, 21 years of age. (B) Notwithstanding subparagraph (A), the nonminor is a ward who has been receiving aid pursuant to Article 5 (commencing with Section 11400) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 9 between January 1, 2012, and December 31, 2012, and attains 19 years of age prior to January 1, 2013, or who has been receiving that aid between January 1, 2013, and December 31, 2013, and attains 20 years of age prior to January 1, 2014, and who may continue to receive aid under the applicable program, provided that the nonminor dependent continues to meet all other applicable eligibility requirements as specified in Section 11403. (2) The ward meets either of the following conditions: (A) The ward was removed from the physical custody of his or her parents or legal guardian, adjudged to be a ward of the juvenile court under Section 725, and ordered into foster care placement as a ward. (B) The ward was removed from the custody of his or her parents or legal guardian as a dependent of the court with an order for foster care placement as a dependent in effect at the time the court adjudged him or her to be a ward of the juvenile court under Section 725.  (3) The rehabilitative goals of the minor or nonminor, as set forth in the case plan, have been met, and juvenile court jurisdiction over the minor or nonminor as a ward is no longer required.   (3) The juvenile court has determined that jurisdiction over the minor or nonminor as a ward pursuant to Section 602 is no longer required.  (4) (A) If the ward is a minor, reunification services have been terminated; the matter has not been set for a hearing for termination of parental rights pursuant to Section 727.3 or for the establishment of guardianship pursuant to Section 728; the return of the child to the physical custody of the parents or legal guardian would create a substantial risk of detriment to the child's safety, protection, or physical or emotional well-being; and the minor has indicated an intent to sign a mutual agreement, as described in subdivision (u) of Section 11400, with the responsible agency for placement in a supervised setting as a nonminor dependent. (B) If the ward is a nonminor, he or she has signed a mutual agreement, as described in subdivision (u) of Section 11400, with the responsible agency for placement in a supervised setting as a nonminor dependent or has signed a voluntary reentry agreement, as described in subdivision (z) of Section 11400 for placement in a supervised setting as a nonminor dependent. A runaway and homeless youth shelter licensed by the State Department of Social Services pursuant to Section 1502.35 of the Health and Safety Code shall not be a placement option pursuant to this section. (b) A minor who is subject to the court's transition jurisdiction shall be referred to as a transition dependent. (c) A youth subject to the court's transition jurisdiction who is 18 years of age or older shall be referred to as a nonminor dependent.