Assembly | 04/28/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |