Senate | 06/11/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4991.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |