|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6635.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4901.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5280.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|