California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 6, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2014

Amended

Bill June 11, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014